Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giacinto Ignazio Pellegrini, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Krk (Veglia), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Oct 1738Born
26 Jul 176122.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
30 Mar 178950.4AppointedBishop of Krk (Veglia), Croatia
13 Apr 178950.4Ordained BishopBishop of Krk (Veglia), Croatia
Oct 1792³53.9DiedBishop of Krk (Veglia), Croatia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giacinto Ignazio Pellegrini
Bishop Giacinto Ignazio Pellegrini O.P. (born , died Oct 1792) Bishop of Krk (Veglia)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZara, Archdiocese of Zadar (Zara)

  • a priest for 31.1 years
  • a bishop for 3.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 434
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1789, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast