Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Niccol˛ Cardinal Pandolfini

Deceased

Bishop of Pistoia, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of San Cesareo in Palatio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1440Born
23 Dec 147434.9AppointedBishop of Pistoia, Italy
1 Jul 151777.5Elevated to Cardinal
6 Jul 151777.5InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Cesareo in Palatio
17 Sep 151878.7DiedBishop of Pistoia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Niccol˛ Pandolfini (VIAF: 47866597)
Niccol˛ Cardinal Pandolfini (born 1440, died ) Bishop of Pistoia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFirenze, Archdiocese of Firenze {Florence}

  • a cardinal for 1.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 1 Jul 1517
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 275
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 216
  • b: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1474, Number 54*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast