Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Girolamo Cardinal Pamphilj

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of San Biagio dell’Anello


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1544Born
9 Jun 160460.4Elevated to Cardinal
25 Jun 160460.4InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Biagio dell’Anello
11 Aug 161066.6DiedCardinal-Priest of San Biagio dell’Anello

MicroData Summary for Girolamo Pamphilj
Girolamo Cardinal Pamphilj (born 1544, died ) Cardinal-Priest of San Biagio dell’Anello

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 6.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 9 Jun 1604

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast