Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Pallás y Faro, O.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Fo-Kien, China

Titular Bishop of Sinopoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Dec 1706Born
11 Jul 175346.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Fo-Kien, China
11 Jul 175346.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Sinopoli
5 Aug 175346.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sinopoli
6 Mar 177871.2DiedVicar Apostolic of Fo-Kien, China

MicroData Summary for Francisco Pallás y Faro
Bishop Francisco Pallás y Faro O.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Fo-Kien

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBenavarre, Spain
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceKe-sen

  • a bishop for 24.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 71, Number 343
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1753, Number 18
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 379, and Page 455
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 9 Dec 2020

Quantcast