Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Mihály Frigyes Cardinal Althan

Deceased

Bishop of Vác, Hungary

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Sabina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jul 1682Born
4 Jan 171835.4SelectedBishop of Vác, Hungary
27 Jun 171835.9ConfirmedBishop of Vác, Hungary
25 Jul 171836.0Ordained BishopBishop of Vác, Hungary
29 Nov 171937.3Elevated to Cardinal
16 Sep 172038.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Sabina
20 Jun 173451.9DiedBishop of Vác, Hungary

MicroData Summary for Mihály Frigyes Althan (VIAF: 22889674)
Mihály Frigyes Cardinal Althan (born , died ) Bishop of Vác

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGlatz, Diocese of Hradec Králové, Czech Republic
Ordained BishopImperial Palace of La Favorite, Church, Wien, Diocese of Wien, Austria
Death PlaceVác, Diocese of Vác
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Vác, Diocese of Vác

  • a bishop for 15.9 years
  • a cardinal for 14.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 29 Nov 1719
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 402
  • ob/c2+: CB, 17 Oct 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1718, Number 59
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 52, Number 3,610
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 60, Number 4,537

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast