Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Paderi

Deceased

Bishop of Ogliastra, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Dec 1826Born
15 Mar 185124.2Ordained PriestPriest of Ogliastra, Italy
28 Mar 190073.2AppointedBishop of Ogliastra, Italy
29 Jul 190073.6Ordained BishopBishop of Ogliastra, Italy
30 Oct 190679.8DiedBishop of Ogliastra, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Paderi
Bishop Giuseppe Paderi (born , died ) Bishop of Ogliastra

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVillaputzu, Diocese of Ogliastra
Ordained BishopCathedral, Cagliari, Archdiocese of Cagliari

  • a priest for 55.6 years
  • a bishop for 6.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 423
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 53, Number 3,824
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1900, Number 44
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 54, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast