Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Coppinger

Deceased

Bishop of Cloyne and Ross, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 May 1753Born
1780²26.6Ordained PriestPriest of Cork, Ireland
15 Jan 178834.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Cloyne and Ross, Ireland
15 Jan 178834.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Axieri (Azieri)
28 Sep 178835.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Axieri (Azieri)
4 Jun 179138.0SucceededBishop of Cloyne and Ross, Ireland
9 Aug 183178.2DiedBishop of Cloyne and Ross, Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for William Coppinger
Bishop William Coppinger (born , died ) Bishop of Cloyne and Ross

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCork
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Cobh

  • a priest for 51.6 years
  • a bishop for 42.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 112, and Page 171
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 222, Number 18,343
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1788, Number 33
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 24, and Page 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast