Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James O’Shaughnessy

Deceased

Bishop of Killaloe, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1745²Born
24 Sep 179853.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Killaloe, Ireland
24 Sep 179853.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Samosata
13 Jan 179954.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Samosata
20 Feb 180762.1SucceededBishop of Killaloe, Ireland
5 Aug 182984.5DiedBishop of Killaloe, Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for James O’Shaughnessy
Bishop James O’Shaughnessy (born 1745, died ) Bishop of Killaloe

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBroadford parish in Co. Clare
Ordained BishopEnnis
Buried Place (Original)Newmarket, Chapel

  • a bishop for 30.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 252, and Page 366
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1799
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 108
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 88, Number 7,391

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast