Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Peter MacMahon (McMahon), O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Killaloe, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1710²Born
16 May 176555.3SelectedBishop of Killaloe, Ireland
5 Jun 176555.4ConfirmedBishop of Killaloe, Ireland
4 Aug 176555.5Ordained BishopBishop of Killaloe, Ireland
20 Feb 180797.1DiedBishop of Killaloe, Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Michael Peter MacMahon (McMahon)
Bishop Michael Peter MacMahon (McMahon) O.P. (born 1710, died ) Bishop of Killaloe

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDoonass, Co. Clare
Ordained BishopThurles
Death PlaceHis Home, Lock Quay
Buried Place (Original)St. John's churchyard

  • a bishop for 41.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 252
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1765, Number 19
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 75, and Page 76

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast