Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gabriel Ortiz de Orbé

Deceased

Bishop of Gaeta, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1600²Born
28 Oct 165151.8AppointedBishop of Gaeta, Italy
5 Nov 165151.8Ordained BishopBishop of Gaeta, Italy
1661¹61.0DiedBishop of Gaeta, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gabriel Ortiz de Orbé
Bishop Gabriel Ortiz de Orbé (born 1600, died 1661) Bishop of Gaeta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastello Mendieta, Archdiocese of Burgos, Spain
Ordained BishopSan Silvestro delle monache, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 9.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 127
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Espańol, Volume 1,500, Page 180, Number 1,124
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1651, Number 26
  • c34: AT, 11 Dec 2016
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Number 19,139

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast