Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Latino Cardinal Orsini

Deceased

Archbishop of Taranto, Italy

Cardinal-Bishop of Frascati

Archpriest of the Arcibasilica di San Giovanni in Laterano {Saint John Lateran Basilica}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1410¹Born
10 Mar 143828.1AppointedArchbishop of Conza, Italy
21 Nov 143828.8SelectedArchbishop of Trani, Italy
8 Jun 143929.4ConfirmedArchbishop of Trani, Italy
20 Dec 144838.9Elevated to Cardinal
3 Jan 144939.0InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo
23 Dec 145040.9AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Urbino, Italy
11 Sep 145242.6ResignedBishop of Urbino, Italy
4 Dec 145444.9AppointedAdministrator of Bari (-Canosa), Italy
1463²53.0AppointedArchpriest of the Arcibasilica di San Giovanni in Laterano {Saint John Lateran Basilica}
7 Jun 146555.4AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
1468²58.0AppointedAdministrator of Polignano (Polinianum), Italy
14 Oct 146858.7AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
1472²62.0ResignedAdministrator of Polignano (Polinianum), Italy
30 Oct 147262.8AppointedArchbishop of Taranto, Italy
6 Nov 147262.8ResignedAdministrator of Bari (-Canosa), Italy
11 Aug 147767.6DiedArchbishop of Taranto, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Latino Orsini
Latino Cardinal Orsini (born 1410, died ) Archbishop of Taranto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)S. Salvatore in Lauro, Convent, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a cardinal for 28.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 260

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 15 Mar 2021

Quantcast