Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Colm O’Reilly

Bishop Emeritus of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois), Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jan 1935 Born
19 Jun 196025.4Ordained PriestPriest of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois), Ireland
24 Feb 198348.1AppointedBishop of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois), Ireland
10 Apr 198348.2Ordained BishopBishop of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois), Ireland
17 Jul 201378.5RetiredBishop of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois), Ireland

MicroData Summary for Colm O’Reilly
Bishop Colm O’Reilly (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceColmcille
Ordained BishopSt. Mel, Cathedral, Clonmacnois, Diocese of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois)

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 121
  • r: Bollettino, 17 Jul 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 79, Number 6,434

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast