Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William O’Meara

Deceased

Bishop of Killaloe, Ireland


Events

DateEventTitle
19 Sep 1743SelectedBishop of Kerry (o Ardfert) e Aghadoe, Ireland
2 Oct 1743ConfirmedBishop of Kerry (o Ardfert) e Aghadoe, Ireland
8 Feb 1753SelectedBishop of Killaloe, Ireland
23 Feb 1753ConfirmedBishop of Killaloe, Ireland
23 Mar 1765³DiedBishop of Killaloe, Ireland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for William O’Meara
Bishop William O’Meara (died ) Bishop of Killaloe

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCo. Tipperary, Archdiocese of Cashel (-Emly)

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 97, and Page 252
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1743, Number 55
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 101

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast