Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johannes Olavinpoika (Olavi)

Deceased

Bishop of ┼bo, Finland


Events

DateEventTitle
25 Jun 1507AppointedBishop of ┼bo, Finland
8 Dec 1507Ordained BishopBishop of ┼bo, Finland
9 Jun 1510DiedBishop of ┼bo, Finland

MicroData Summary for Johannes Olavinpoika (Olavi)
Bishop Johannes Olavinpoika (Olavi) (died ) Bishop of ┼bo

EventPlace
Ordained BishopUppsala, Archdiocese of Uppsala, Sweden

  • a bishop for 2.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 91
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1507, Number 6
  • nm: JI, 1 Apr 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast