Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Luis Bernardino Núñez Villacís

Bishop-Elect of Tulcán, Ecuador


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 May 1963 Born
29 Jun 199027.0Ordained PriestPriest of Ambato, Ecuador
5 Jul 202158.1AppointedBishop of Tulcán, Ecuador
28 Aug 202158.2Ordained BishopBishop of Tulcán, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for Luis Bernardino Núñez Villacís
Father Luis Bernardino Núñez Villacís (born ) Bishop-Elect of Tulcán

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Juan Bautista de Ambato, Diocese of Ambato
Ordained BishopTulcán, Diocese of Tulcán

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Tulcán.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 5 Jul 2021
  • ob: CB, 14 Jul 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 15 Jul 2021

Quantcast