Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pier Francesco Muccioli, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Anagni, Italy

Titular Bishop of Messene


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jul 1781Born
26 May 180422.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
19 Dec 183453.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Anagni, Italy
19 Dec 183453.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Messene
1 Jan 183553.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Messene
1838²56.5ResignedApostolic Administrator of Messene

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pier Francesco Muccioli
Bishop Pier Francesco Muccioli O.F.M. Conv. (born ) Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Anagni

EventPlace
Birth PlacePesaro

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 262
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1835, Number 1
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1835, Page 75

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast