Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dominicus Maria Marchese, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Pozzuoli, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Mar 1633³Born
31 May 168855.2AppointedBishop of Pozzuoli, Italy
8 Jun 168855.2Ordained BishopBishop of Pozzuoli, Italy
May 1692³59.1DiedBishop of Pozzuoli, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Dominicus Maria Marchese
Bishop Dominicus Maria Marchese O.P. (born , died May 1692) Bishop of Pozzuoli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Ordained BishopS. Andre della Valle, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 3.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 325
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1688, Number 14
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 76, Number 6,068

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast