Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Monaldeschi

Deceased

Bishop of Firenze, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
1278²AppointedBishop of Melfi, Italy
11 May 1280AppointedBishop of Orvieto, Italy
13 Sep 1295AppointedBishop of Firenze, Italy
10 Dec 1302DiedBishop of Firenze, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Monaldeschi
Bishop Francesco Monaldeschi (died ) Bishop of Firenze

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBagnorea, Diocese of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea)
Death PlaceFirenze, Diocese of Firenze

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 508, and Page 250
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 334

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 11 May 2021

Quantcast