Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Melchisedechian [Melkisedekian]

Deceased

Bishop of Erzerum (Garin) (Armenian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jul 1848Born
2 Apr 187425.6Ordained PriestPriest of Erzerum (Garin) (Armenian)
1 Oct 191163.1AppointedBishop of Erzerum (Garin) (Armenian)
22 Oct 191163.2Ordained BishopBishop of Erzerum (Garin) (Armenian)
23 Jan 192071.5DiedBishop of Erzerum (Garin) (Armenian)

MicroData Summary for Joseph Melchisedechian [Melkisedekian]
Bishop Joseph Melchisedechian [Melkisedekian] (born , died ) Bishop of Erzerum (Garin)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceErzerum
Ordained BishopSan Nicola da Tolentino, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 45.8 years
  • a bishop for 8.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1911, Number 70
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 168
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 33, Number 1,942

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast