Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bl. Ignatius (Shoukrallah) Maloyan, I.C.P.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Mardin (Armenian), Turkey


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Apr 1869Born
1891²21.7ProfessedMember of Institut du Clergé Patriarcal de Bzommar
12 Jul 189627.2Ordained PriestPriest of Institut du Clergé Patriarcal de Bzommar
1 Oct 191142.4AppointedArchbishop of Mardin (Armenian), Turkey
22 Oct 191142.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Mardin (Armenian), Turkey
11 Jun 191546.1DiedArchbishop of Mardin (Armenian), Turkey
7 Oct 2001Beatified

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bl. Ignatius (Shoukrallah) Maloyan
Archbishop Bl. Ignatius (Shoukrallah) Maloyan I.C.P.B. (born , died ) Archbishop of Mardin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMardin, Archdiocese of Mardin (Armenian)
Ordained BishopSan Nicola da Tolentino, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceMardin, Archdiocese of Mardin (Armenian)

  • a priest for 18.9 years
  • a bishop for 3.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1911, Number 71
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 33, Number 1,942
  • bd/prof/d: CB, 2 Oct 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast