Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Andrzej Madej, O.M.I.

Superior of Turkmenistan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Oct 1951 Born
19 Jun 197725.7Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
29 Sep 199745.9AppointedSuperior of Turkmenistan

MicroData Summary for Andrzej Madej
Father Andrzej Madej O.M.I. (born ) Superior of Turkmenistan

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKazimierz Dolny, Poland

Please contact the Father through the Mission "Sui Iuris" of Turkmenistan.

  • a priest for years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast