Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father John Jocelyn Madden, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Lashio, Myanmar


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1934¹Born
18 Mar 196531.2Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
20 Nov 197541.8AppointedPrefect of Lashio, Myanmar
9 Apr 197642.2InstalledPrefect of Lashio, Myanmar
19 Dec 198551.9ResignedPrefect of Lashio, Myanmar
20 Feb 1987²53.1DiedPrefect Emeritus of Lashio, Myanmar

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for John Jocelyn Madden
Father John Jocelyn Madden S.D.B. (born 1934, died ) Prefect Emeritus of Lashio

EventPlace
Ordained PriestMandalay-Lafons
Death PlacePerth, Archdiocese of Perth, Australia

  • a priest for 21.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 2 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast