Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Telmo Maceira

Deceased

Bishop of Tuy, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Feb 1798Born
Dec 1824³26.8Ordained PriestPriest
11 Jul 185254.4SelectedBishop of Mondoñedo, Spain
27 Sep 185254.6ConfirmedBishop of Mondoñedo, Spain
9 Jan 185354.9Ordained BishopBishop of Mondoñedo, Spain
30 Apr 185557.2SelectedBishop of Tuy, Spain
28 Sep 185557.6ConfirmedBishop of Tuy, Spain
9 Aug 186466.4DiedBishop of Tuy, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Telmo Maceira
Bishop Telmo Maceira (born , died ) Bishop of Tuy

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTuy
Ordained BishopCathedral, Tui, Diocese of Tuy

  • a priest for 39.6 years
  • a bishop for 11.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 386, and Page 570
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 162, Number 887
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1853, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast