Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Agostino Maria León, O.P. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Canelos, Ecuador


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Aug 1868Born
17 Mar 192657.6AppointedPrefect of Canelos e Macas, Ecuador
Jun 1936³67.8ResignedPrefect of Canelos, Ecuador

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Agostino Maria León
Father Agostino Maria León O.P. (born ) Prefect Emeritus of Canelos

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCuenca, Diocese of Cuenca

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1933
  • b: CB, 22 Mar 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast