Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Berndard-Emmanuel (François-Pierre) de Lenzbourg, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Bishop of Lausanne, Switzerland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Nov 1723Born
174117.0ProfessedMember of Order of Cistercians
23 Dec 174724.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Cistercians
17 Feb 178359.2AppointedBishop of Lausanne, Switzerland
24 Aug 178359.7Ordained BishopBishop of Lausanne, Switzerland
14 Sep 179571.7DiedBishop of Lausanne, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Berndard-Emmanuel (François-Pierre) de Lenzbourg
Bishop Berndard-Emmanuel (François-Pierre) de Lenzbourg O. Cist. (born , died ) Bishop of Lausanne

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFribourg
Ordained BishopBellelay

  • a priest for 47.7 years
  • a bishop for 12.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 110, Number 9,703
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1783, Number 21
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 255
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 47, Number 3,236

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast