Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franz Xaver Kuttnar

Deceased

Bishop of Lavant, Slovenia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Oct 1793Born
21 Dec 181623.1Ordained PriestPriest of Ljubljana, Slovenia
23 Nov 184350.0AppointedBishop of Lavant, Slovenia
3 Mar 184450.3Ordained BishopBishop of Lavant, Slovenia
8 Mar 184652.3DiedBishop of Lavant, Slovenia

MicroData Summary for Franz Xaver Kuttnar (VIAF: 221006861)
Bishop Franz Xaver Kuttnar (born , died ) Bishop of Lavant

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSchahmannstal
Ordained BishopSalzburg, Archdiocese of Salzburg, Austria

  • a priest for 29.2 years
  • a bishop for 2.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 233
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1844, Number 16
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 38, Number 2,364

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast