Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Josef Kupka

Deceased

Bishop of Brno, Czech Republic


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 May 1862Born
20 Sep 188422.3Ordained PriestPriest
10 Apr 192461.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Brno, Czech Republic
10 Apr 192461.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Adraa
7 Sep 192462.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Adraa
22 Oct 193169.4AppointedBishop of Brno, Czech Republic
10 Jun 194179.0DiedBishop of Brno, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Josef Kupka
Bishop Josef Kupka (born , died ) Bishop of Brno

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCerna-Hora
Ordained BishopCathedral, Brno, Diocese of Brno

  • a priest for 56.7 years
  • a bishop for 16.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,896
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1924, Number 54
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 23, Number 1,331

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast