Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henrich von Klingenberg

Deceased

Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1240¹Born
9 Aug 129353.6AppointedBishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
8 Mar 130464.1Ordained BishopBishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
12 Sep 130666.6DiedBishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Henrich von Klingenberg (VIAF: 32808376)
Bishop Henrich von Klingenberg (born 1240, died ) Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}

  • a bishop for 2.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 204
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 121, Number 10,804
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 102, Number 8,813

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 23 Dec 2020

Quantcast