Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Pierre-Jean Kerhervé, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Priest of La Société des Missions Etrangères


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1725¹Born
20 Sep 174924.7Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
27 Jul 176237.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Se-Ciuen (Setchoan, Szechwan, Sichuan), China
27 Jul 176237.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Gortyna
22 Jan 176641.0DiedPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Pierre-Jean Kerhervé
Father Pierre-Jean Kerhervé M.E.P. (born 1725, died ) Priest of La Société des Missions Etrangères

EventPlace
Birth PlaceQuimper, Diocese of Quimper, France
Death PlaceChantaboun

  • a priest for 16.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 227, and Page 455
  • b: CB, 26 Dec 2014
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 12 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast