Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luzius Iter

Deceased

Bishop of Chur, Switzerland


Events

DateEventTitle
26 Apr 1542AppointedBishop of Chur, Switzerland
4 Jan 1545Ordained BishopBishop of Chur, Switzerland
4 Dec 1549DiedBishop of Chur, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Luzius Iter
Bishop Luzius Iter (died ) Bishop of Chur

EventPlace
Ordained BishopMeersburg
Death PlaceChur, Diocese of Chur

  • a bishop for 4.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 183
  • ob/c2+: CB, 1 Dec 2012
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1545, Number 1
  • d: CB, 16 Jan 2020
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 91, Number 7,675

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast