Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Hussey

Deceased

Bishop of Waterford and Lismore, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Apr 1746³Born
17 Dec 176822.7Ordained DeaconDeacon
25 Mar 176922.9Ordained PriestPriest
10 Jan 179750.7AppointedBishop of Waterford and Lismore, Ireland
26 Feb 179750.9Ordained BishopBishop of Waterford and Lismore, Ireland
11 Jul 180357.2DiedBishop of Waterford and Lismore, Ireland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Thomas Hussey (VIAF: 273287660)
Bishop Thomas Hussey (born Apr 1746, died ) Bishop of Waterford and Lismore

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBallybogan, Harristown, Co. Meath
Ordained BishopSt. Nicolas, Dublin, Archdiocese of Dublin
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Waterford, Diocese of Waterford and Lismore

  • a priest for 34.2 years
  • a bishop for 6.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 446
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1797, Number 46
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 52
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 75, Number 5,990
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 86, Number 7,146

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast