Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop St. Godehard von Hildesheim, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Hildesheim, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
960¹Born
30 Nov 102262.9AppointedBishop of Hildesheim, Germany
2 Dec 102262.9Ordained BishopBishop of Hildesheim, Germany
5 May 103878.3DiedBishop of Hildesheim, Germany
1131²Canonized

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for St. Godehard von Hildesheim (VIAF: 266734993)
Bishop St. Godehard von Hildesheim O.S.B. (born 960, died ) Bishop of Hildesheim

EventPlace
Birth PlaceReichersdorf
Ordained BishopGroner Pfalzkapelle

  • a bishop for 15.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 23 Mar 2021

Quantcast