Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jacques Georges Habib Hafouri

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Hassaké-Nisibi (Syrian), Syria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Aug 1916Born
28 Jan 194023.4Ordained PriestPriest
18 Mar 198265.5AppointedArchbishop of Hassaké-Nisibi (Syrian), Syria
13 Aug 198265.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Hassaké-Nisibi (Syrian), Syria
28 Jun 199679.8RetiredArchbishop of Hassaké-Nisibi (Syrian), Syria
4 May 201194.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Hassaké-Nisibi (Syrian), Syria

MicroData Summary for Jacques Georges Habib Hafouri
Archbishop Jacques Georges Habib Hafouri (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Hassaké-Nisibi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDamas
Ordained BishopCathedral, Damas, Archdiocese of Damas (Syrian)

  • a priest for 71.2 years
  • a bishop for 28.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 5 May 2011
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 76, Number 6,140

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 23 Nov 2020

Quantcast