Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ludovicus Giustiniani, O.S.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Assisi, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Nov 1620Born
1 Sep 167049.7AppointedBishop of Assisi, Italy
7 Sep 167049.7Ordained BishopBishop of Assisi, Italy
20 Jun 168564.5DiedBishop of Assisi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ludovicus Giustiniani
Bishop Ludovicus Giustiniani O.S.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Assisi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFoligno, Diocese of Foligno
Ordained BishopS. Marcel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 14.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 101
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1670, Number 24
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 72, Number 5,716

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast