Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ulrich Geislinger, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Augsburg, Germany

Titular Bishop of Adramyttium


Events

DateEventTitle
23 Mar 1474AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Augsburg, Germany
23 Mar 1474AppointedTitular Bishop of Adramyttium
3 Apr 1474Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Adramyttium
16 Feb 1493DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Augsburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Ulrich Geislinger
Bishop Ulrich Geislinger O.F.M. (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Augsburg

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSanta Maria del Anima, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 18.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 80
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 118, Number 10,531
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1474, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast