Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paternus Nicholas Joannes Cornelius Geise, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Bogor, Indonesia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Feb 1907Born
6 Mar 193225.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
17 Dec 194841.8AppointedPrefect of Sukabumi, Indonesia
16 Oct 196154.6AppointedBishop of Bogor, Indonesia
6 Jan 196254.9Ordained BishopBishop of Bogor, Indonesia
30 Jan 197567.9ResignedBishop of Bogor, Indonesia
1 Aug 199588.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Bogor, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Paternus Nicholas Joannes Cornelius Geise
Bishop Paternus Nicholas Joannes Cornelius Geise O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Bogor

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRotterdam, Netherlands

  • a priest for 63.4 years
  • a bishop for 33.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1962, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast