Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Jan Geerits, S.D.S.

Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Comores


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Mar 1958 Born
3 Aug 198527.3Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Savior
6 Jun 200648.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of Comores
1 May 201052.1ResignedApostolic Administrator of Comores

MicroData Summary for Jan Geerits
Father Jan Geerits S.D.S. (born ) Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Comores

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBree, Diocese of Ličge (Luik, Lüttich), Belgium

Please contact the Father through the Apostolic Administration of Comores.

  • a priest for years

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast