Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Petro Gebey (Ghebi, Gebé)

Deceased

Bishop of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jul 1864Born
13 Oct 188925.2Ordained PriestPriest
16 Jul 192459.9AppointedBishop of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine
3 Aug 192460.0Ordained BishopBishop of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine
26 Apr 193166.7DiedBishop of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Petro Gebey (Ghebi, Gebé)
Bishop Petro Gebey (Ghebi, Gebé) (born , died ) Bishop of Mukachevo (Munkács)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKalnik

  • a priest for 41.5 years
  • a bishop for 6.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1931
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1932
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1924, Number 47

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast