Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ramón Garcia y Antón, O.S.H. †

Deceased

Bishop of Tuy, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Sep 1797Born
5 Dec 186467.2SelectedBishop of Tuy, Spain
27 Mar 186567.5ConfirmedBishop of Tuy, Spain
2 Jul 186567.8Ordained BishopBishop of Tuy, Spain
7 Apr 187678.5DiedBishop of Tuy, Spain

MicroData Summary for Ramón Garcia y Antón (VIAF: 309576948)
Bishop Ramón Garcia y Antón O.S.H. (born , died ) Bishop of Tuy

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRelleu, Diocese of Orihuela
Ordained BishopCathedral, Valencia, Archdiocese of Valencia

  • a bishop for 10.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 571
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 172, Number 946
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1865, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast