Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Igino Gamboa Satrustegui, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Aguarico, Ecuador

Titular See: (Miguel de Arruazu)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jan 1913Born
15 Aug 193017.5Temporary VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
21 Mar 193724.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
30 Mar 195441.2AppointedPrefect of Aguarico, Ecuador
196551.9ResignedPrefect of Aguarico, Ecuador
6 Mar 200087.1DiedPrefect Emeritus of Aguarico, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for Igino Gamboa Satrustegui
Father Igino Gamboa Satrustegui O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Aguarico

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArruazu, Spain
Death PlacePamplona, Archdiocese of Pamplona y Tudela, Spain

  • a priest for 62.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1964

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast