Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Angel de la Calle Fontecha, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Prefect of Yueyang [Yochow], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jan 1886Born
19 Sep 190317.6ProfessedMember of Order of St. Augustine
26 Jul 191125.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of St. Augustine
16 Jan 193245.9AppointedPrefect of Yueyang [Yochow], China
2 Aug 196478.5DiedPrefect of Yueyang [Yochow], China

MicroData Summary for Angel de la Calle Fontecha
Father Angel de la Calle Fontecha O.S.A. (born , died ) Prefect of Yueyang [Yochow]

EventPlace
Birth PlacePuebla de Valdavia, Diocese of León, Spain

  • a priest for 53.0 years

Source(s):
  • prof/op/d: CB, 18 Jul 2014
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 27 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast