Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Richard FitzNeal

Deceased

Bishop of London, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
15 Sep 1189AppointedBishop of London, England, Great Britain
31 Dec 1189Ordained BishopBishop of London, England, Great Britain
10 Sep 1198DiedBishop of London, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Richard FitzNeal
Bishop Richard FitzNeal (died ) Bishop of London

EventPlace
Ordained BishopLambeth

  • a bishop for 8.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 51
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 283
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 92, Number 7,769

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast