Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wilhelm von Essern (Effern)

Deceased

Bishop of Worms, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1565¹Born
12 Sep 160540.6AppointedBishop of Worms, Germany
15 Aug 161247.6Ordained BishopBishop of Worms, Germany
7 Jul 161651.5DiedBishop of Worms, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Wilhelm von Essern (Effern)
Bishop Wilhelm von Essern (Effern) (born 1565, died ) Bishop of Worms

EventPlace
Ordained BishopChapel, Château, Udenheim

  • a bishop for 3.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 372
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1612, Number 19
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 63, Number 4,855

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast