Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Baldwin (Wilfred) Dworschak, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Abbot Emeritus of Order of Saint Benedict

Titular See: President/American-Cassinese Congregation OSB


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Mar 1906Born
11 Jul 192721.3ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
1933²26.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
28 Dec 195044.8AppointedAbbot of Order of Saint Benedict
1971²64.8ResignedAbbot of Order of Saint Benedict
16 Jun 199690.2DiedAbbot Emeritus of Order of Saint Benedict

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Baldwin (Wilfred) Dworschak (VIAF: 26151110625337061057)
Abbot Baldwin (Wilfred) Dworschak O.S.B. (born , died ) Abbot Emeritus of Order of Saint Benedict

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArcadia, WI, USA
Buried Place (Original)St. John's Abbey, Cemetery, Collegeville, MN, USA

  • a priest for 63.4 years

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 8 Sep 2021

Quantcast