Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tomé de Faría, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Lisboa, Portugal

Titular Bishop of Targa


Events

DateEventTitle
24 Mar 1581ProfessedMember of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
22 Aug 1616AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lisboa, Portugal
22 Aug 1616AppointedTitular Bishop of Targa
15 Jan 1617Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Targa
23 Oct 1628DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Lisboa, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Tomé de Faría
Bishop Tomé de Faría O. Carm. (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Lisboa

EventPlace
Ordained BishopLisboa, Archdiocese of Lisboa

  • a bishop for 11.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 327
  • ob/c2: CB, 28 Nov 2014
  • ob/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1617, Number 1
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 67, Number 5,230
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 71, Number 5,608

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 11 Apr 2021

Quantcast