Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jerónimo Nosti de Valdés, O.S.Bas. †

Deceased

Bishop of Santiago de Cuba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1649²Born
11 Feb 170455.1AppointedBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)
28 Sep 170455.7Ordained BishopBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)
14 Dec 170556.9AppointedBishop of Santiago de Cuba
29 Mar 172980.2DiedBishop of Santiago de Cuba

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jerónimo Nosti de Valdés
Bishop Jerónimo Nosti de Valdés O.S.Bas. (born 1649, died ) Bishop of Santiago de Cuba

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAramil, Spain
Ordained BishopS. Basile le Grand, Madrid, Archdiocese of Toledo, Spain
Death PlaceHavana

  • a bishop for 24.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 225, and Page 321
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 23, Number 32
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1704, Number 16
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 57, Number 4,239
  • c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 59, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 61, Number 4,620

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast