Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Constitutional Bishop Éléonore-Marie Desbois de Rochefort] †

Civil Constitution of the Clergy

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of [Somme (Constitutional), France]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Apr 1749Born
15 Mar 179141.8SelectedBishop of [Somme (Constitutional), France]
3 Apr 179141.9Ordained BishopBishop of [Somme (Constitutional), France]
Oct 1801³52.4ResignedBishop of [Somme (Constitutional), France]
5 Sep 180758.3DiedBishop Emeritus of [Somme (Constitutional), France]

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Éléonore-Marie Desbois de Rochefort (VIAF: 32106998)
Bishop Éléonore-Marie Desbois de Rochefort (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Somme

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Death PlaceParis, Archdiocese of Paris

  • a bishop for 16.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1791, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast