Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Georges Cardinal d’Amboise (II)

Deceased

Archbishop of Rouen, France

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Marcellino e Pietro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1488¹Born
6 Aug 151123.5AppointedArchbishop of Rouen, France
11 Dec 151325.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Rouen, France
16 Dec 154557.9Elevated to Cardinal
7 Sep 154658.6InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Susanna
28 Feb 155062.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Marcellino e Pietro
25 Aug 155062.6DiedArchbishop of Rouen, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Georges d’Amboise (II) (VIAF: 287185793)
Georges Cardinal d’Amboise (II) (born 1488, died ) Archbishop of Rouen

EventPlace
Birth Place
Ordained BishopGaillon, Château, Gaillon, Eure, Archdiocese of Rouen
Death PlaceVigay, Château, Vigay
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Rouen, Archdiocese of Rouen

  • a bishop for 36.7 years
  • a cardinal for 4.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 16 Dec 1545
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1513, Number 12
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 287
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 44, Number 2,933

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast