Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Maria Cotroneo

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Zoara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Oct 1713Born
22 Dec 173623.1Ordained PriestPriest
15 Mar 177359.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Zoara
16 Apr 1773³59.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zoara
5 Nov 178067.0DiedTitular Bishop of Zoara

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Maria Cotroneo
Bishop Francesco Maria Cotroneo (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Zoara

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMessina, Archdiocese of Messina, Italy
Buried Place (Original)S. Paolo dei Disciplinanti, Church, Messina, Archdiocese of Messina, Italy

  • a priest for 43.8 years
  • a bishop for 7.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 450
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1773, Number 39
  • ob/c12/d/loc: AT, 14 Feb 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 15 Feb 2021

Quantcast