Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Corcoran

Deceased

Bishop of Kildare and Leighlin, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1758²Born
20 Mar 181557.2AppointedBishop of Kildare and Leighlin, Ireland
21 Sep 181557.7Ordained BishopBishop of Kildare and Leighlin, Ireland
22 Feb 181961.1DiedBishop of Kildare and Leighlin, Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Michael Corcoran
Bishop Michael Corcoran (born 1758, died ) Bishop of Kildare and Leighlin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCo. Laois
Ordained BishopDublin, Archdiocese of Dublin
Buried Place (Original)Church, Tullow

  • a bishop for 3.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1815, Number 39
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 227
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 25
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 86, Number 7,161

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast